judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00873-CV
05-89-00873-CV
07/24/1989
Other Personal Injury
Atkins, McIntyre
Bix Manufacturing Company, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/16/1997Record RetentionDestroy
07/18/1991Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
12/12/1990Mandate Issued
12/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/12/1990Submission
09/12/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
09/12/1990Submitted
08/08/1990MattConv
05/15/1990Submission
04/02/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/30/1990Motion for Postponement
03/21/1990MattConv
01/26/1990Brief Filed
01/26/1990Case ready to be set
01/26/1990Case ready to be set
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/19/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/07/1989Brief Filed
11/09/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989Response to Motion
11/07/1989Letter Filed
11/03/1989Response to Motion
11/02/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/31/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/30/1989Response to Motion
10/18/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/12/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/1989Exhibits Filed
10/09/1989Response to Motion
10/09/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/09/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/29/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/24/1989Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1989Response to Motion
08/18/1989MattConv
08/15/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
08/15/1989Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Denied
08/15/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/14/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
08/10/1989Motion to Substitute Attorney
08/01/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/31/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/24/1989Transcript Filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/03/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/03/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
298th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Adolph P Canales
86-6350-M