judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00754-CR
01-89-00754-CR
07/24/1989
Other Drug Possession
Reyes, Richard Earl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/18/1990Supplemental transcript filed
01/11/1990Motion to withdraw appeal
12/14/1989Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
10/18/1989Brief due for retained counsel
09/15/1989Transcript filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/20/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
07/20/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantCarl C. Croy
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 10
Harris
8909166
60 dys, credit 2, $500 fin