judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00184-CR
12-89-00184-CR
07/25/1989
Other Felony
Creech, Sammy
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1990
12/21/1989Letter from the Court
12/18/1989Mandate Issued
11/30/1989
11/15/1989
10/31/1989Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/31/1989No Description Available.Dismissed
10/31/1989Case ready to be set
10/31/1989Submission
10/31/1989Submitted
10/24/1989Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
10/20/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/20/1989Letter from the Court
10/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/15/1989Brief Filed
08/17/1989
07/31/1989No Description Available.
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/21/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
07/17/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
12/18/2014RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
123rd District Court
Honorable Donald R. Ross
14,022
5 yrs. TDC