judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00272-CV
08-89-00272-CV
07/25/1989
Contract
Nissalke, Thomas
Westwood Racquetball Club
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/14/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/09/1992Fee paid
12/08/1989Shuck purged
12/08/1989Mandate Issued
12/08/1989Mandate Issued
10/04/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/04/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/04/1989Submission
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Case ready to be set
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/14/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Hurlie H. Collier
UnknownAppelleeHon. Alvin L. Zimmerman
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
87-43880