judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1077-89
PD-1077-89
07/25/1989
PDR Case Type
MEDRANO, JOSE ESTRADA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
12/20/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
11/27/1989REHEAR FILED
11/07/1989REHEAR EXT MOTION
11/07/1989REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/25/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/25/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/22/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateStephen W. Simmons
Medrano, Jose EstradaApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jose Estrada Medrano
Court of Appeals Information:
08-88-00013-CR
Aff 4-12-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Virgil Mulanax
51638-210