judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8890
C-8890
07/25/1989
Mandamus/Cause
CITIES OF BRIDGE CITY NEDERLAND PORT ARTHUR and VIDOR
THE THIRD COURT OF APPEALS AUSTIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/05/1989Reply BriefRespondentP.U.C.'S REPLY TO MOTION FOR EMERGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL TEMPORARY
10/05/1989Reply BriefRespondentGULF STATES REPLY TO MOTION FOR EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RELIEF
08/07/1989Brief in Support of PetitionFILED DUE TO GRANT.
08/07/1989Supplemental Brief filedRelator
08/01/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelatorBEHALF/TEXAS STATE AGENCIES - ATTY/ W.SCOTT MCCOLLOUGH, ASST. A.G., BOX 12548, AUSTIN 78711 - 462-3773.
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentBEHALF/GULF STATES UTILITIES, BARRY BISHOP, P. O. BOX 1148, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78767-1148
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentTHIRD COURT OF APPEALS
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentBEHALF/PUBLIC UTILITY COMM. ATTY/ KAREN PETTIGREW, ASST. ATTY. GENERAL, P. O. BOX 12548, AUSTIN, TX 78711-2548
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/22/1990Cost letter issued787 SW2D 946
05/21/1990Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED.
05/21/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksREL/MO F/EMER.SUPPL.TEMP RELIEF - ORIGINAL MISSING - FILED 9/29/89.
04/26/1990cover ltr with jmt
04/25/1990Opinion issuedopinion in mandamus dismissing petitionPER CURIAM OPINION. (CONSOLIDATED WITH C-8889). 787 SW2D 946
04/25/1990Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposeddismissed as moot
04/25/1990Stay order vacated. See remarks & op/disp screenOF 8/7/89 TO 3RD CA.
10/11/1989Oral argument VACATEDSETTING F/ORAL ARGUMENT VACATED
10/09/1989Reply to Response to MotionRELATORS RESPONSE TO GULF STATES' MOTION TO DISMISS
10/05/1989Motion to dismiss application for writ of errorP.U.C.'S MOTION TO DISMISS
10/05/1989Reply BriefP.U.C.'S REPLY TO MOTION FOR EMERGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL TEMPORARY
10/05/1989Reply BriefGULF STATES REPLY TO MOTION FOR EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RELIEF
09/29/1989Motion for temporary reliefMO EMERGENCY SUPP TEMP RELIEF
09/29/1989Motion to dismiss application for writ of errorON BEHALF OF GULF STATES UTILITIES COMPANY ('GULF STATES')
09/29/1989Request made for reply to proceedingBY OCTOBER 5 FR/PUC & GULF STATES UTILITIES COMPANY.
08/08/1989Order from Lower Court filedFROM COA COMPLYING WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER
08/07/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.RELS - 25/10 MIN. RSPS - 25 MIN. (CONSOLIDATED W/C-8889 FOR ARGUMENT).
08/07/1989Brief in Support of PetitionFILED DUE TO GRANT.
08/07/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedFiling grantedSTAY ORDER ISSUED
08/07/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedFiling granted
08/07/1989Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedFILED DUE TO GRANT.
08/07/1989Stay Order issuedTO 3RD CA TO STAY THEIR ORDER OF JULY 19, 1989 SUSPENDING FINAL JUDG.OF 250TH D.C. OF JULY 10, 1989.
08/07/1989Supplemental Brief filed
08/01/1989Appendix to any instrumentAPPENDIX TO GULF STATES REPLY
08/01/1989Brief in Support of PetitionBEHALF/TEXAS STATE AGENCIES - ATTY/ W.SCOTT MCCOLLOUGH, ASST. A.G., BOX 12548, AUSTIN 78711 - 462-3773.
08/01/1989No description available.
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusBEHALF/GULF STATES UTILITIES, BARRY BISHOP, P. O. BOX 1148, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78767-1148
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusBEHALF/PUBLIC UTILITY COMM. ATTY/ KAREN PETTIGREW, ASST. ATTY. GENERAL, P. O. BOX 12548, AUSTIN, TX 78711-2548
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusTHIRD COURT OF APPEALS
07/27/1989Letter FiledLETTER FROM MR. KAUFMAN REQUESTING LEAVE TO JOIN AS A RELATOR
07/25/1989Exhibits receivedINCORPORATED IN M/L/F
07/25/1989Motion for temporary relief
07/25/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
07/25/1989Petition for writ receivedINCORPORATED IN M/L/F
07/25/1989Request made for reply to proceedingON OR BEFORE AUG 1, 1989 (S. BERGEN WILL RESPOND/ BARRY BISHOP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
03-89-00093-CV
Grant
___ SW2d ___, 07-19-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
250th District Court
Travis
Honorable Harley Clark
447,502-A