judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8889
C-8889
07/25/1989
Mandamus/Cause
COALITION OF CITIES FOR AFFORDABLE UTILITY RATES and THE
THE THIRD COURT OF APPEALS AUSTIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/10/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/09/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/06/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/07/1989Brief in Support of PetitionFILED DUE TO GRANT.
08/04/1989Supplemental Brief filedRelator
08/01/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelatorBEHALF/TEXAS STATE AGENCIES - ATTY/ W.SCOTT MCCOLLOUGH, ASST.A.G., BOX 12548, AUSTIN 78711 - 462-3773.
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentTHIRD COURT OF APPEALS
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentBEHALF/GULF STATES UTILITIES, BARRY BISHOP, P. O. BOX 1148, AUSTIN, TX 78767-1148
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentBEHALF/PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION, KAREN PETTIGREW, ASST. ATTY. GENERAL, P. O. BOX 12548, AUSTIN, TX 78711-2548
07/25/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/10/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/09/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/06/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/22/1990Cost letter issued787 SW2D 946
05/21/1990Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED.
04/26/1990cover ltr with jmt
04/25/1990Opinion issuedopinion in mandamus dismissing petitionPER CURIAM OPINION (CONSOLIDATED WITH C-8890). 787 SW2D 946
04/25/1990Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposeddismissed as moot
04/25/1990Stay order vacated. See remarks & op/disp screenOF 8/7/89 TO 3RD CA.
10/11/1989Oral argument VACATEDSETTING F/ORAL ARGUMENT VACATED
10/09/1989Reply to Response to MotionREPLY TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS
10/05/1989Motion to dismiss application for writ of errorP.U.C.'S MOTION TO DISMISS
09/29/1989Motion to dismiss application for writ of errorON BEHALF OF GULF STATES UTILITY COMPANY ('GULF STATES')
08/08/1989No description available.
08/08/1989Order from Lower Court filedFROM COA COMPLYING WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER
08/07/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.RELS/25-10 MIN. REBUT. RSP/25 MIN. (CONSOLIDATED W/C-8890 FOR ARGUMENT)
08/07/1989Brief in Support of PetitionFILED DUE TO GRANT.
08/07/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedFiling grantedSTAY ORDER ISSUED
08/07/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedFiling granted
08/07/1989Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedFILED DUE TO GRANT.
08/07/1989Stay Order issuedTO 3RD CA STAYING THEIR ORD/OF 19, 1989 WHICH SUSPENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF 250TH DIST.CT. OF 7/10/89.
08/04/1989Supplemental Brief filed
08/01/1989Appendix to any instrumentTO GULF STATES REPLY
08/01/1989Brief in Support of PetitionBEHALF/TEXAS STATE AGENCIES - ATTY/ W.SCOTT MCCOLLOUGH, ASST.A.G., BOX 12548, AUSTIN 78711 - 462-3773.
08/01/1989No description available.
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusBEHALF/GULF STATES UTILITIES, BARRY BISHOP, P. O. BOX 1148, AUSTIN, TX 78767-1148
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusBEHALF/PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION, KAREN PETTIGREW, ASST. ATTY. GENERAL, P. O. BOX 12548, AUSTIN, TX 78711-2548
08/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusTHIRD COURT OF APPEALS
07/27/1989Letter FiledLETTER FROM MR. KAUFMANN REQUESTING LEAVE TO JOIN AS A RELATOR
07/25/1989Brief in Support of Petition
07/25/1989Motion for temporary reliefINCORPORATED WITH M/L/F
07/25/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
07/25/1989Petition for writ received
07/25/1989Request made for reply to proceedingON OR BEFORE AUG 1, 1989. (S. BERGEN WILL RESPOND/ BARRY BISHOP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ARTHUR, PORT NECHES, ROSE CITYRespondentMs. Grace Casstevens
Union Carbide CorporationRespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
SILSBEE, SOUR LAKE VIDORRespondentMs. Grace Casstevens
OLIN CORPORATIONRespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
BRIDGE CITY, CHINA GROVES,RespondentMs. Grace Casstevens
P.D. GLYCOL, TEXAS CHEMICALRespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
CITIES OF BEAUMONT, BEVIL OAKSRespondentMs. Grace Casstevens
GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.RespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
E.I. DEPONE DE NEMOURS & CO.RespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
UNION OIL CO OF CALIFORNIARespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
NEDERLAND, NOME ORANGE, PORTRespondentMs. Grace Casstevens
TEXAS INDUSTRIAL ENERGY CONSU-RespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
FIRESTONE SYNTHETIC RUBBER CORespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
GULF STATES UTILITIES COMPANYRespondentMr. Donald Clements Jr.
Mr. Barry K. Bishop
MOBIL CHEMICAL COMPANYRespondentMr. Rex D. VanMiddlesworth
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSIONRespondentMs. Susan Bergen Schultz
NORTH STAR STEEL OF TEXAS, INCRespondentMr. Kenneth G. Hurwitz
CITIES OF CONROE, CUT N' SHOORelatorMr. James G. Boyle
Court of Appeals Information:
03-89-00093-CV
Grant
___ SW2d ___, 07-19-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
250th District Court
Travis
Honorable Harley Clark
447,502-A