judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1076-89
PD-1076-89
07/25/1989
PDR Case Type
CHILDERS, B. D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/23/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/27/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/23/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/25/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CHILDERS, B. D.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)William B. Smith
STATE OF TEXASStateMark H. Dettman
Court of Appeals Information:
08-88-00243-CR
Aff 4-19-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court
Midland
Honorable James Fitz-Gerald III
45,046