judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00686-CV
14-89-00686-CV
07/24/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Nickerson, Allen Bernard
Davidson, David Judge of 11th Judicial District, Harris
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/12/1990Case stored
11/14/1989Writ of Error DISPOSEDDISMISSED
10/18/1989Writ of Error DISPOSEDDISMISSED
09/08/1989Writ of Error FILED
08/29/1989Writ of Error RECEIVED
08/10/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
08/10/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
08/03/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
07/24/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
07/24/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationPRO SEAllen Bernard Nickerson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondent
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
861,6337