judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00358-CV
04-89-00358-CV
07/24/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Texas Paper Stock Company, Inc., Relator
The Honorable Carol Haberman, Respondent
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1993Information regarding cause received
10/20/1993Information regarding cause received
06/07/1993Information regarding cause received
06/07/1993Information regarding cause received
06/07/1993Information regarding cause received
12/29/1989Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
12/29/1989Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
09/14/1989Submitted
09/14/1989Submission
09/14/1989Submitted
09/12/1989Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Motion to Supplement Record Filed
09/06/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
08/02/1989Response to Motion Filed
07/27/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/1989No Description Available.
07/24/1989Writ of Mandamus Received
07/24/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus Filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/29/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
45th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
85-CI-15109
n/a