judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00884-CR
01-89-00884-CR
08/30/1989
Burglary
Giddens, Kenneth E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/11/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/04/1991Higher court decisionDismissed
10/10/1990Order enteredGrant motion
10/10/1990Writ disposedGrant motion
08/03/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
08/02/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
07/30/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
07/20/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
07/05/1990Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
07/05/1990Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
06/20/1990Submitted
06/20/1990Submission
06/20/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
04/27/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
04/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/02/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/29/1990Submission
03/29/1990Submission
03/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/01/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/08/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/23/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/04/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/07/1989Statement of facts filed
11/27/1989Brief due for retained counsel
11/24/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/24/1989Motion to supplement record
10/16/1989Transcript filed
08/30/1989Notice of appeal filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. John E. Wright
StateCriminal - State of TexasMary Klapperich
StateCriminal - State of TexasFreddie Lee Blazek
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Walker
15,399-C
30 yrs tdc