judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01032-CR
05-89-01032-CR
08/30/1989
Other Drug Possession
Waits, Linda Kay
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
04/13/1990Mandate Issued
04/13/1990Mandate Issued
02/13/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
02/13/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
02/13/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
02/13/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
01/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/25/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/18/1990Letter Sent by the Court
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/30/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/17/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/03/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/28/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/29/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/31/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F88-68751-KL
3 yrs TDC