judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01031-CV
05-89-01031-CV
08/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Campbell, Linda Stoffers
Diversified Insurance Services, Inc
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/27/2001Order enteredDestroy
08/27/2001Order EnteredDestroy
06/28/1990Mandate Issued
06/28/1990Mandate Issued
05/08/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
05/08/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
05/01/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
05/01/1990Submitted
03/15/1990MattConv
01/25/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
12/14/1989Brief Filed
12/14/1989Case ready to be set
12/14/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/30/1989Brief Filed
10/16/1989Exhibits Filed
10/12/1989MattConv
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
10/05/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/1989Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/1989Response to Motion
09/29/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/25/1989Extend Time to File Record
09/25/1989MattConv
09/25/1989Transcript Filed
09/13/1989Motion - Ext to File Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989Response to Motion
08/30/1989Appeal Bond Filed
08/30/1989MattConv
08/30/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/23/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/27/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Dallas
CC88-1014-E