judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00813-CR
14-89-00813-CR
08/30/1989
Felony DWI
The State of Texas
Davis, Diane Dell
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/27/1991Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
07/18/1990Case stored
07/10/1990Mandate Issued
07/10/1990Mandate Issued
06/25/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/08/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
05/24/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
05/24/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
05/09/1990Exhibits FILED
05/09/1990No description available.
05/03/1990Order Entered
05/01/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
05/01/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
03/08/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/08/1990Case ready to be set
03/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/08/1990Case ready to be set
02/28/1990Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
02/27/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/10/1989State's Brief FILED NO - APP
10/19/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/16/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/13/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/31/1989Transcript FILED
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
08/16/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeRobert L. Orozco
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Stacy Scofield
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Brazos
68-89