judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01034-CR
05-89-01034-CR
08/30/1989
Other Drug Sale
Johnson, Lester Kenard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/26/1990Mandate Issued
11/26/1990Mandate Issued
09/20/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
03/20/1990Brief Filed
03/20/1990Case ready to be set
03/20/1990Case ready to be set
03/07/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/16/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/22/1989Brief Filed
11/27/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
11/08/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/26/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/17/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/16/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F89-79983-TR
Life, TDC