judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01033-CR
05-89-01033-CR
08/30/1989
Other Drug Sale
Davis, Walter Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/27/1990Mandate Issued
09/27/1990Mandate Issued
07/27/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/19/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
06/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
02/20/1990Brief Filed
02/20/1990Case ready to be set
02/20/1990Case ready to be set
02/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Brief Filed
10/24/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/18/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/25/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F89-77909-R
75 yrs TDC