judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01036-CR
05-89-01036-CR
08/30/1989
Other Drug Possession
Walton, John Lewis
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/19/1989Record RetentionDestroy
12/19/1989Mandate Issued
12/19/1989Motion to Expedite MandateMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
12/19/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
12/19/1989Mandate Issued
12/11/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
11/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/16/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/10/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/11/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/19/1989Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F89-76860-LR
5 yrs TDC