judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01035-CR
05-89-01035-CR
08/30/1989
Other Drug Sale
Walters, Neal Anthony
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1991Mandate Issued
04/04/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/12/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
11/12/1990Record RetentionDestroy
11/12/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
11/12/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
11/12/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
10/16/1990Submitted
10/16/1990Submission
10/16/1990Submission
10/16/1990Submitted
08/20/1990MattConv
04/20/1990Brief Filed
04/20/1990Case ready to be set
04/20/1990Case ready to be set
03/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/25/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/24/1990Brief Filed
01/24/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/17/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/13/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/23/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/18/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/04/1991Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F89-81048-R
7 yrs TDC