judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01037-CV
05-89-01037-CV
08/30/1989
Contract
Burkhalter, J. E.
Fidelity National Bank of Dallas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/14/1999Record RetentionDestroy
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
10/01/1990Response to Motion
09/27/1990Motion to File Disposed
09/25/1990Motion for Leave to File
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submitted
01/31/1990MattConv
11/10/1989Brief Filed
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
10/16/1989Brief Filed
10/04/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/28/1989Response to Motion
09/25/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/11/1989MattConv
08/30/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/15/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/18/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
88-1544-A