judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01030-CR
05-89-01030-CR
08/30/1989
Burglary
Jackson, Scott Gene
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
04/24/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
04/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/24/1990Submission
04/24/1990Submitted
04/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/24/1990Submission
04/24/1990Submitted
02/12/1990MattConv
01/05/1990Case ready to be set
01/05/1990Brief Filed
01/05/1990Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/12/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/14/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Richard Mays
F89-79591-MQ
20 yrs TDC