judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00303-CV
08-89-00303-CV
08/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Brown, Bruce W. and Joanne Brown
Swift-Eckrich, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/06/2011Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/30/1990Mandate Issued
11/30/1990Shuck purged
11/30/1990Mandate Issued
10/17/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
10/17/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
06/18/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/07/1990Application for Writ of Error
06/07/1990Fee paid
05/18/1990Fee paid
05/09/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/27/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
04/26/1990Fee paid
04/23/1990Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
04/23/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/04/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/04/1990Payment of fee due requested
04/04/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/05/1990Submitted
01/05/1990Submission
01/05/1990Submitted
12/21/1989Brief Filed
12/01/1989Submission
10/26/1989Brief Filed
10/26/1989Case ready to be set
10/26/1989Case ready to be set
10/02/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Fee paid
09/13/1989Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/13/1989Payment of fee due requested
09/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/13/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
09/13/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
09/13/1989Transcript Filed
09/13/1989Transcript Filed
09/05/1989Fee paid
08/30/1989Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
08/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/30/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. H. Keith Myers
UnknownAppellantHon. Michael J. Sullivan
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
El Paso
Honorable John L. Fashing
89-333