judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00890-CR
01-89-00890-CR
08/31/1989
Felony DWI
Reynolds, Clyde Herbert
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/01/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/01/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
05/17/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/02/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/24/1991Submitted
04/24/1991Submission
04/24/1991Submitted
02/20/1991Submission
01/04/1991Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/04/1991Case ready to be set
01/04/1991Case ready to be set
12/27/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/13/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/19/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/08/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/29/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/04/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/24/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/06/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/28/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/27/1990Statement of facts filed
07/12/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
06/27/1990Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
06/22/1990Statement of facts filed
06/22/1990Supplemental transcript filed
04/19/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
03/30/1990Motion to abate appeal
02/15/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
02/05/1990Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
01/04/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
01/04/1990Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
12/20/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
12/20/1989Motion to substitute counsel
11/29/1989Brief due for retained counsel
10/25/1989Transcript filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/29/1989Notice of appeal filed
08/07/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/01/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - AppellantMark A. Goldberg
StateCriminal - State of TexasMark Font
StateCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 12
Harris
8915503
$300 fine, 150 dys off hrs