judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00889-CR
01-89-00889-CR
08/31/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Doria, Javier Hernandez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/26/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/13/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
09/28/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
09/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Submitted
06/20/1990Submission
06/20/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
03/15/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/15/1990Case ready to be set
03/15/1990Case ready to be set
03/01/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/01/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/16/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/08/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/24/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/20/1989Statement of facts filed
12/20/1989Supplemental transcript filed
11/09/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/27/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/17/1989Transcript filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/25/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/25/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
StateCriminal - State of TexasHon. Carol Davies
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantEllen L. Swierczek
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
524,432
20 yrs tdc