judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00814-CR
14-89-00814-CR
08/30/1989
Burglary
Scott, Dennis Earl
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/05/1991Case stored
02/05/1991Mandate Issued
02/05/1991Mandate Issued
01/21/1991No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/04/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/19/1990Submitted
12/19/1990Submission
12/19/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/23/1990Case ready to be set
05/23/1990Case ready to be set
04/26/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/19/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/26/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/01/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/26/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/22/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/20/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/20/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/08/1989Transcript FILED
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/21/1989Motion for new trial FILED
07/21/1989Date of Sentence
07/21/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/05/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWilliam M. Hicks
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger L. Ezell
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
Honorable ISRAEL LERNER
88CR1061
20 years TDC