judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01025-CV
05-89-01025-CV
08/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
The Fidelity & Casualty Co. of New York (A New Hampshire Cor
A. H. Underwood, d/b/a Lakeside Veterinary Clinic
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/1997Record RetentionRetain
08/09/1990Mandate Issued
08/09/1990Mandate Issued
06/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/23/1990Submission
03/23/1990Submitted
03/23/1990Submission
03/23/1990Submitted
02/28/1990MattConv
01/02/1990Letter Filed
01/02/1990Brief Filed
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
12/06/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Exhibits Filed
11/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/30/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Response to Motion
10/20/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/06/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/1989Response to Motion
09/26/1989MattConv
09/19/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/30/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/06/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Richard A. Bosworth
87-54