judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00421-CR
04-89-00421-CR
08/30/1989
Other Drug Sale
Saldana, Jesse Alvarez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/01/1999Case Returned from Higher Court
02/22/1999Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/08/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/08/1990Mandate Issued
02/08/1990Mandate Issued
12/13/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/13/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1989Submitted
11/22/1989Submission
11/22/1989Submitted
11/07/1989Submission
10/09/1989Brief Filed
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
09/12/1989Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
09/12/1989Brief Filed
09/07/1989Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
09/07/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989No Description Available.
08/30/1989No Description Available.
08/30/1989No Description Available.
08/30/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/20/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
04/28/2014Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Susan D. Reed
88-CR-4269
Life in TDC