judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00423-CR
04-89-00423-CR
08/30/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Dexter, William Clyde
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/1990Motion Filed
10/23/1989Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
10/23/1989Mandate Issued
10/23/1989Mandate Issued
10/17/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/29/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
09/13/1989Motion for New Trial Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/24/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/1989Case StoredCase stored
10/23/2014RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sharon S Macrae
88-CR-5976
6 years TDC