judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00882-CV
01-89-00882-CV
08/30/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Wheeler, E. L., and Gulf Bank Road Auto Supply, Inc.
Aguilar, Stephen
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/04/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/04/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/20/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
10/05/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Supplemental brief filed
03/13/1990Submitted
03/13/1990Submission
03/13/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Submission
12/11/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/11/1989Case ready to be set
12/11/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/09/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/16/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/14/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/14/1989Statement of facts filed
09/11/1989Filing fee paid
08/30/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/30/1989Transcript filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/29/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeHon. Mark Mueller
StateAppellantJohn K. George
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
83-35185