judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00817-CV
14-89-00817-CV
08/31/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Estate of Stone, Omah McDonald, Deceased
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/23/1990Case stored
06/25/1990Mandate Issued
06/25/1990Mandate Issued
05/25/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/18/1990Submitted
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Submission
11/09/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/09/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/09/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
11/09/1989No description available.
11/09/1989Case ready to be set
11/03/1989Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
10/26/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/26/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
10/26/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
09/29/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/07/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/31/1989Transcript FILED
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/13/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/15/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Harry A. Dolan
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Richard I. Colton
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 3
Harris
226,020