judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00350-CV
13-89-00350-CV
08/31/1989
Unknown Civil Case Type.
First Financial Development Corp. and Williams Construction
Hughston, Janie
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/08/1992Mandate Issued
06/22/1992Record returned to Court.
06/17/1992Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/20/1992Decision Withdrawn
05/20/1992Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
05/20/1992Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
01/30/1991Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1991Cite for opinions
12/03/1990Supreme Court Number
11/16/1990Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
11/16/1990Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
11/14/1990Writ of Error Fee Paid
11/12/1990Writ Filed
11/12/1990Writ of Error Fee Paid
11/07/1990Writ Filed
11/07/1990Writ of Error Fee Paid
10/11/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/11/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/11/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/19/1990Letter sent
09/18/1990Motion for rehearing filed
09/17/1990Motion for rehearing filed
09/06/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered in part/Affirmed in part
06/13/1990Submitted
06/13/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
04/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
04/16/1990Submission
02/27/1990Letter sent
02/23/1990List of Authorities
02/15/1990Copy of a motion
02/14/1990Reply brief markd
02/14/1990Reply Brief Filed
01/26/1990Additional Copies of Brief
01/18/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Oral argument requested
01/03/1990Sworn Statement filed
12/27/1989Letter sent
12/21/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/19/1989Miscellaneous Motion
12/14/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/14/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/06/1989Response to _____________.
12/06/1989Response to _____________.
12/04/1989Response to _____________.
12/04/1989Response to _____________.
11/30/1989Miscellaneous Motion
11/28/1989Motion to Strike
11/22/1989Letter sent
11/22/1989Response to _____________.
11/21/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedDismissed as Moot
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/21/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/20/1989Response to _____________.
11/17/1989Miscellaneous Motion
11/16/1989Letter sent
11/15/1989Supplement filed
11/15/1989Supplemental Citations
11/15/1989Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
11/15/1989Letter sent
11/10/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/08/1989Exhibits Filed
11/06/1989Notice was filed
11/06/1989SUGGESTION OF DEATH
11/06/1989Copy of an order
10/27/1989Oral argument requested
10/27/1989Brief Filed
10/27/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Copy of an order
10/23/1989Address Change
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989Letter sent
09/27/1989Due date for record to be filed
09/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/31/1989Transcript Received
08/31/1989Transcript Filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/25/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/25/1989Letter sent
08/25/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/25/1989Filing Fee Paid
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/08/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
First Financial & Williams ConAppellantDon E. Williams
HughstonAppelleeHon. Edward A. Stapleton III
John Haywood
Trial Court Information
Honorable B. B. Schraub