judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00352-CV
13-89-00352-CV
08/31/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Herrera, Raul, Maria San Juanita Herrera, et al.
Jimenenz-Chapa, Juan F., M.D. and Victor Haddad, M.D.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1990Mandate Issued
10/04/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/01/1990Response to _____________.
09/18/1990Motion for rehearing filed
09/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/30/1990Supplemental Citations
04/26/1990Submitted
04/26/1990Submission
04/19/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Document Filed
04/11/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
04/11/1990Letter sent
04/06/1990Miscellaneous Motion
03/06/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
03/05/1990Submission
01/19/1990Letter sent
01/04/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Miscellaneous Motion
12/14/1989Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Denied
12/08/1989Filing Fee Paid
12/07/1989Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/07/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/06/1989Response to _____________.
12/01/1989Motion for Leave to File Statement of Facts
12/01/1989Statement of Facts Received
12/01/1989Exhibits received
12/01/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/28/1989Opposition filed
11/27/1989Letter sent
11/22/1989Additional copies of the motion in opposition
11/22/1989Motion to Supplement Record
11/22/1989Filing Fee Paid
11/16/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/16/1989Additional copy(s) of Motion to Dismiss
11/15/1989Motion to Supplement Record
11/15/1989Opposition filed
11/09/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/30/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/05/1989List of Authorities
10/04/1989Letter sent
09/29/1989Brief Filed
09/29/1989Oral argument requested
09/29/1989Brief Does not Comply
09/29/1989Case ready to be set
09/29/1989Address Change
09/26/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/15/1989Letter sent
09/08/1989Due date for record to be filed
09/06/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/31/1989Transcript Received
08/31/1989Transcript Filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
139th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Raul L Longoria
C-2757-83-C