judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00888-CR
01-89-00888-CR
08/31/1989
Felony DWI
Harberson, Curtis Edward
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/16/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/21/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
12/06/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/30/1990Submitted
10/30/1990Submission
10/30/1990Submitted
10/23/1990Statement of facts filed
10/23/1990Supplemental transcript filed
09/20/1990Order enteredAbate case
09/12/1990Submission
08/15/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
08/15/1990Case ready to be set
08/15/1990Motion to abate appeal
08/15/1990Case ready to be set
08/09/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/30/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/05/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/22/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/17/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/09/1990Statement of facts filed
05/03/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/19/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
02/08/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/24/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/14/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/04/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/29/1989Brief due for retained counsel
10/24/1989Statement of facts filed
10/24/1989Transcript filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/29/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/29/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantMark McIntyre
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 6
Harris
89,12106
45 days, 2 credit; $100 fn