judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00887-CV
01-89-00887-CV
08/31/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Mmeh, Etim
Steeplechase Nissan
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/24/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/24/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/07/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
03/23/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
03/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/16/1990Submitted
01/16/1990Submission
01/16/1990Submitted
01/10/1990Motion for leave to file
12/07/1989Submission
11/01/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/01/1989Case ready to be set
11/01/1989Case ready to be set
10/09/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/08/1989Filing fee paid
09/08/1989Statement of facts filed
09/01/1989Transcript filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/25/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeWilliam T. Green III
StateAppellantHon. Wilbur M. Cameron, III
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
521,823