judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00221-CR
02-89-00221-CR
08/30/1989
All Misdemeanors
Dominguez, Amelio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/1991Mandate Issued
11/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/26/1990Submitted
06/26/1990Submission
06/12/1990Order Entered
04/26/1990Brief Filed
03/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/14/1990Brief Filed
02/14/1990Submission
01/04/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/15/1989No Description Available.
09/14/1989No Description Available.
09/12/1989No Description Available.
09/12/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dominguez, AmelioCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Clifford Davis
0324925
120da.Jail,$2,000.Fine -