judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00220-CR
02-89-00220-CR
08/30/1989
All Misdemeanors
Dominguez, Amelio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/08/1990Mandate Issued
08/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/26/1990Submitted
06/26/1990Submission
06/12/1990Order Entered
04/05/1990Brief Filed
03/07/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/09/1990Brief Filed
02/09/1990Submission
01/04/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/30/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989No Description Available.
11/17/1989No Description Available.
09/14/1989No Description Available.
09/12/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/12/1989No Description Available.
08/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dominguez, AmelioCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable James O. Mullin, Judge, 43rd District Court
0310249
$2,000.Fine,CC $163.18mo.-