judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TANGEMANN BENEDICT CORPORATION v. MAX MAXFIELD, WYOMING SECRETARY OF STATE, in his official capacity

Case Heading (S-10-0223)
Case Number:S-10-0223Case Docketed On:10/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:TANGEMANN BENEDICT CORPORATION v. MAX MAXFIELD, WYOMING SECRETARY OF STATE, in his official capacity
Full Title:TANGEMANN BENEDICT CORPORATION, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MAX MAXFIELD, WYOMING SECRETARY OF STATE, in his official capacity, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTangemann Benedict CorporationKermit C. Brown
Timothy M. Stubson
Thomas E. Lubnau II
AppelleeMax MaxfieldBruce A. Salzburg
Michael M. Robinson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Federal, Other
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/14/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/14/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
11/02/2010Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
11/08/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/08/2010Affidavit - Affidavit of costs and expensesAffidavitAffidavit of costs and expensesFinal
11/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Appellant's Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Timothy M. Stubson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael M. Robinson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/11/2011Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - stipulated motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/14/2011Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
03/17/2011Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of case. The matter is now moot, and he will be filing a motion to dismiss in the next few days.EventPhone CallFinal
03/28/2011Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
03/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated motion to dismiss certified question for mootness; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/28/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal