judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00355-CV
04-89-00355-CV
07/21/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Florentino Longoria
Gloria Longoria
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/08/1990Original Exhibits Returned
01/08/1990Mandate Issued
01/08/1990Mandate Issued
11/20/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/31/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/20/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/26/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/26/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/22/1989Exhibits received
09/22/1989No Description Available.
09/22/1989Exhibits Filed
09/22/1989No Description Available.
09/15/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/14/1989No Description Available.
07/21/1989No Description Available.
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/10/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/17/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Rose Spector
87-PA-01559
n/a