judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EICON VS. CHRISTENSEN

Case Information: 33459
Short Caption:EICON VS. CHRISTENSENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A380841Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00353
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/31/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00576
03/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Mailed on: 3/3/99. 99-01568
03/05/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Mailed on: 3/3/99. 99-01569
03/05/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. Mailed on: 3/3/99. 99-01570
03/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-01874
03/16/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.