judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1317
Short Caption:CHARLES E. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-5411-10Filed Date:10/22/2010

Opening Event Date:10/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles E. Young YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (292 pgs. - Davis) (6/28-30/10 proceedings) (Transferred from appeal no. 10-CF-856)
10/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/05/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Tonya L. Fleming, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
11/05/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Tonya L. Fleming, Esquire
12/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/03/2010RECEIVED - mot for appeal transcript
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18 pgs/tape) 3/30/10 proc.
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5 pgs/tape) 4/12/10 proc.
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (7 pgs/tape) 5/13/10 proc.
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (5 pgs/tape) 6/4/10 proc.
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (7 pgs/tape) 6/23/2010 proc.
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (15 pgs/tape) 10/8/10 proc. w/cd
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/07/2011RECORD INDEX
01/07/2011RECORD COPIES
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/21/11. no oppo
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. (JAC)
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/21/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
03/21/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/attached documents (unopposed)
03/28/2011 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellant to supplement the record with the lodged document that were part of the record in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged document will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. (JAC)
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (exh 1 PD dtd 3/27/10)
04/25/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/25/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/05/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
05/19/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/13/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Thompson, Pryor
11/09/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
12/01/2011FiledMandate
12/06/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed