judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5361
B-5361
06/11/1975
Application for Writ of Error
AMERICAN PAPER STOCK COMPANY
L. M. HOWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/27/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/18/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
06/11/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/28/1975Response to Motion filed
10/27/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/15/1975Opinion issued
10/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
06/18/1975Response to Petition
06/11/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/11/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L. M. HowardRespondent
American Paper Stock CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information