judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5360
B-5360
06/10/1975
Application for Writ of Error
C. H. CHRISTIAN, ET AL.
DON HOWETH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/15/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/28/1975Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
06/25/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
06/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1975Response to Motion filed
10/15/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/28/1975Supplement to Petition filed
06/25/1975Response to Petition
06/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/10/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Don Howeth, et al.Respondent
C. H. Christian, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information