judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5389
B-5389
06/25/1975
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST NATIONAL BANK IN GRAND PRARIE, TEXAS
LONE STAR LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/29/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/14/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
06/25/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/05/1975Response to Motion filed
10/29/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/15/1975Opinion issued
09/08/1975Letter Filed
07/14/1975Response to Petition
07/02/1975Letter Filed
06/25/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/25/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lone Star Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
First National Bank in Grand Prarie, TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information