judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1075-89
PD-1075-89
07/24/1989
PDR Case Type
BARBER, W. S., BARBER, B. S. & BROWN, JEAN C.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/16/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/30/1989BRIEF FILEDState
07/24/1989RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/1991MANDATE ISSD
01/30/1991OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
03/28/1990SUBMITTED
01/03/1990MOTIONGranted
01/02/1990MOTION FILED
12/20/1989SET FOR SUBMIS
11/29/1989NO BRIEF FILED
11/22/1989MOT PLACED IN FILE
11/22/1989MOTION FILED
11/16/1989BRIEF FILED
11/16/1989STRIKE BR MOT TOFiled
11/16/1989STRIKE BR MOT TODENIED
10/30/1989BRIEF FILED
09/27/1989PDR DISPGranted
08/25/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/24/1989PDR FILED
07/24/1989RESPONSE FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateDavid Brabham
BARBER, W. S.BARBERB. S. &Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Harry R. Heard
L. G. Hawkins
Rex Houston
Court of Appeals Information:
06-82-00080-CR
Rev & Rem 5-31-89
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
188th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Marcus Vascocu
12,965-B