judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALBERT E. BRAVEBOY V. D.C. DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REG. AFFAIRS

Case Information: 10-AA-1316
Short Caption:ALBERT E. BRAVEBOY V. D.C. DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REG. AFFAIRSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Regulatory Affairs
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DCRA353-10Filed Date:10/27/2010

Opening Event Date:10/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAlbert E. Braveboy N
Morris R. BattinoYN
RespondentD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/27/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/27/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/27/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
07/20/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
07/20/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until October 15, 2011 (Petitioner)Granted
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until October 15, 2011 (Petitioner)
10/12/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
10/12/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
11/08/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)
12/16/2011FiledTMC//RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
01/12/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Petitioner)
01/19/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file opposition to motion to dismiss petition for review.
01/19/2012FiledOrder Granting petitoner's motion to dismiss. (OBTEST)
01/19/2012FiledDismissed
01/19/2012FiledOpposition to respondnet's motion to dismiss (Petitioner)
02/10/2012FiledMandate