judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00859-CV
05-89-00859-CV
07/21/1989
Worker's Compensation
Ernest Dale Thomas
Johnson Controls, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/20/1997Record RetentionDestroy
07/22/1991Mandate Issued
07/22/1991Mandate Issued
12/10/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Motion or Writ Denied
05/14/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/12/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/26/1990Response to Motion
03/15/1990Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
03/09/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Motion to Show Authorities
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Letter Filed
02/13/1990Submitted
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Submitted
02/05/1990Motion to Show Authorities
12/21/1989MattConv
10/05/1989Case ready to be set
10/05/1989Brief Filed
10/05/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Letter Filed
09/14/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/11/1989Brief Filed
08/24/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/21/1989Response to Motion
08/14/1989Affidavit Filed
08/14/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
08/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/08/1989Motion to Compel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1989Motion to Compel
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/17/1989Letter Sent by the Court
07/13/1989Transcript Filed
06/19/1989Affidavit Filed
03/21/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
44th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Candace G. Tyson
88-732-B