judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5388
B-5388
06/25/1975
Application for Writ of Error
DOUGLAS W. POWELL
ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/1975Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/13/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/28/1975Letter brief Petitioner
07/17/1975Letter brief Respondent
07/10/1975Letter brief Petitioner
07/09/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
07/01/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/25/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/24/1975Reply to Response
10/22/1975Response to Motion filed
10/13/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/28/1975Letter brief
09/12/1975Motion to dismissOverruled
07/17/1975Letter brief
07/10/1975Motion to ExpediteOverruled
07/10/1975Letter brief
07/09/1975Response to Petition
07/01/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/25/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/25/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Douglas W. PowellPetitioner
Electronic Data Systems CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information