judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00861-CR
05-89-00861-CR
07/21/1989
All Misdemeanors
Dunham, Eldridge Clark
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1990Mandate Issued
06/15/1990Mandate Issued
04/16/1990Record RetentionDestroy
04/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
01/25/1990MattConv
10/20/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Brief Filed
10/20/1989Case ready to be set
09/28/1989Brief Filed
08/28/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/24/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/21/1989Transcript Filed
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/25/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/15/1990Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Curt B. Henderson
219-80638-88
2 yrs TDC