judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9143
A-9143
07/19/1962
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
CHARLES H. MEYER
W. C. LINDREY, W. G. WALLY, JR., R. E. ALBERTSON, CHARLES A. KOHLER, M. L. LEFLER, JR. AND AUBREY T. RAIFORD, BERT TUNKS, DISTRICT JUDGE, STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/06/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/01/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/27/1962Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedPetitioner
07/19/1962Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
07/19/1962Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/03/1962Opinion issued
08/27/1962Order from Lower Court filed
08/06/1962Reply to Response
08/01/1962Response to Petition
07/31/1962Response to Petition
07/27/1962Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
07/25/1962Motion to dismiss
07/19/1962Exhibits in case/cause filed
07/19/1962Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
07/19/1962Order from Lower Court filed
07/19/1962Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. C. Lindrey, W. G. Wally, Jr., R. E. Albertson, Charles A. Kohler, M. L. Lefler, Jr. and Aubrey T. RaifordRespondent
Charles H. MeyerPetitioner
Bert Tunks, District JudgeRespondent
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information