judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9159
A-9159
07/30/1962
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
BUCK C. MILLER
P. FRANK LAKE, SECRETARY OF STATE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/27/1962Notice of Appeal filedRelator
08/14/1962Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
08/13/1962Motion for RehearingRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/13/1962Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
10/17/1962Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
08/29/1962Affidavit filed
08/28/1962Order from Lower Court filed
08/27/1962Notice of Appeal filed
08/24/1962Order from Lower Court filed
08/14/1962Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
08/13/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/02/1962Response to Motion filed
07/30/1962Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Buck C. MillerRelator
P. Frank Lake, Secretary of StateRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information