judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9198
A-9198
08/13/1962
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF WESLACO, ET AL.
GENERAL TELEPHONE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHWEST
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/24/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/17/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/17/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/27/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/23/1962Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/13/1962Appendix FiledRespondent
08/13/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
08/13/1962Appendix FiledPetitioner
08/13/1962Appendix FiledPetitioner
08/13/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/24/1963Motion for Rehearing
01/17/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/17/1962Reply to Response
10/27/1962Reply to Response
08/23/1962Response to Petition
08/13/1962Appendix Filed
08/13/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1962Appendix Filed
08/13/1962Appendix Filed
08/13/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
General Telephone Company of the SouthwestRespondent
City of Weslaco, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information